Global Patent Index - EP 1017608 A1

EP 1017608 A1 2000-07-12 - PREPARATION OF A COTTON WOOL END OF A LINE OF COTTON WOOL

Title (en)

PREPARATION OF A COTTON WOOL END OF A LINE OF COTTON WOOL

Title (de)

VORBEREITUNG EINES WATTEENDES EINER WATTEBAHN

Title (fr)

PREPARATION DE L'EXTREMITE D'UNE BANDE DE COTON HYDROPHILE

Publication

EP 1017608 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936619 A

Priority

  • DE 19742300 A
  • IB 9801266 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19742300A1] The invention relates to a method or a device for carrying out a method for preparing a cotton wool end (E) of a line of cotton wool (B) for subsequent reprocessing of the same. Known devices for preparing a cotton wool end of a roll (W) usually operate by holding the cotton wool (B) in one or two clamping points and then tearing it apart. The actual tear line is not clearly defined. The aim of the invention is to remedy this problem. To that end, the line of cotton wool (B) is clamped across its width and the free end (E) extending beyond the clamping point (K) is separated immediately after the clamping point (K) by a current of pressurised air generated across more or less the width of the line of cotton wool (B). Said pressurised air current can be generated by a pressurised air nozzle (32) whose outlet (33) is situated adjacently and directly on the output side of the clamping device (K).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/08; B65H 19/20; D01G 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/08 (2006.01); B65H 19/20 (2006.01); B65H 67/08 (2006.01); D01G 27/00 (2006.01); D06H 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06H 7/22 (2013.01); B65H 67/086 (2013.01); D01G 27/00 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915453A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19742300 A1 19990401; AU 8556698 A 19990412; CN 1097022 C 20021225; CN 1271327 A 20001025; EP 1017608 A1 20000712; EP 1017608 B1 20020320; JP 2001517739 A 20011009; WO 9915453 A1 19990401; WO 9915453 A8 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080818

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070827

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2005-08-12 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050812

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-09-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-07-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020724

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803460 20020425

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2002-03-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010717

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI