Global patent index - EP 1017609 A1

EP 1017609 A1 2000-07-12 - LADLE LOOP

Title (en)

LADLE LOOP

Title (de)

PFANNENSCHLAUFE

Title (fr)

BOUCLE POUR POCHE DE COULEE

Publication

EP 1017609 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954165 A

Priority

  • DE 9802697 W
  • DE 19742326 A
  • DE 19840537 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915455A1] The present invention relates to a ladle loop used as a connecting member between a pivot mounted on a ladle and the bail of a crane, wherein said loop comprises two parallel spaced-apart brackets. A bushing is provided in one end region for surrounding the pivot of the loop, while a pivot is provided in the other end region in the bail jaw of the crane hook. The bushing (4, 23), the pivot (11) and the brackets (2, 3, 21, 22) are made of materials having the same quality and are connected together so as to form a closed isotensile chain link while optimising the weight and shape.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 1/66; B22D 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/06 (2006.01); B66C 1/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/06 (2013.01); B66C 1/66 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915455A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FI FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915455 A1 19990401; AT 245122 T 20030815; AU 1141999 A 19990412; DE 29824783 U1 20020829; EP 1017609 A1 20000712; EP 1017609 B1 20030716

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ASKU-SCHOLTEN GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59809026

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-07-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59809026

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150918

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151008

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150911

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2004-09-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040909

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809026

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR GB IT LU NL

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANNESMANNROEHREN-WERKE AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020722

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR GB IT LU NL