Global Patent Index - EP 1017677 A1

EP 1017677 A1 2000-07-12 - 4-PHENYLTETRAHYDROCHINOLINE UTILIZED AS AN INHIBITOR OF THE CHOLESTEROL ESTER TRANSFER PROTEIN

Title (en)

4-PHENYLTETRAHYDROCHINOLINE UTILIZED AS AN INHIBITOR OF THE CHOLESTEROL ESTER TRANSFER PROTEIN

Title (de)

4-PHENYLTETRAHYDROCHINOLINE ALS HEMMER DES CHOLESTEROLESTERTRANSFERPROTEINS

Title (fr)

4-PHENYLTETRAHYDROQUINOLINES UTILISEES COMME INHIBITEUR DE LA PROTEINE DE TRANSFERT DE L'ESTER DE CHOLESTEROL

Publication

EP 1017677 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948921 A

Priority

  • DE 19741399 A
  • EP 9805658 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19741399A1] 4-(Optionally substituted phenyl)-5-hydroxy-5,6,7,8-tetrahydroquinoline derivatives (I) and their salts and N-oxides are new. Hydroxy-tetrahydroquinoline derivatives (I) and their salts and N-oxides are new: A = phenyl optionally mono- or disubstituted by halo, CF3, 1-3C alkyl or 1-3C alkoxy; D = -CR<5>R<6>R<7> or -CH2-O-CH2-R<8>; R<5>, R<6> = H; or R<5> = H; and R<6> = halo or OH; or R<5>+R<6> = an oxo group; R<7> and R<8> = phenyl, naphthyl, benzothiazolyl, quinolyl, pyrimidyl or pyridyl optionally mono- to tetrasubstituted by halo, CF3, NO2, CN, OCF3, SO2CH3 or NR<9>R<10>; R<9>, R<10> = H or 1-3C alkyl; E = 3-6C cycloalkyl or 1-8C alkyl; R<1> = OH; R<2> = H or methyl; R<3>, R<4> = 1-3C alkyl; or R<3>+R<4> = 2-4C alkylene chain. An Independent claim is included for the preparation of (I).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 215/20; A61K 31/47; C07D 401/06; C07D 417/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/47 (2006.01); A61K 31/4709 (2006.01); A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); C07D 215/20 (2006.01); C07D 221/20 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 417/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 221/20 (2013.01); C07D 215/20 (2013.01); C07D 401/06 (2013.01); C07D 417/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915504A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19741399 A1 19990325; AU 9537098 A 19990412; EP 1017677 A1 20000712; JP 2001517655 A 20011009; US 2002042515 A1 20020411; US 2002165252 A1 20021107; US 2003232990 A1 20031218; US 6291477 B1 20010918; US 6562976 B2 20030513; US 6897317 B2 20050524; WO 9915504 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100108

2009-09-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2009-09-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070910

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER HEALTHCARE AG

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE