Global patent index - EP 1017685 A1

EP 1017685 A1 2000-07-12 - NEW 2-(3H)-OXAZOLONE DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

NEW 2-(3H)-OXAZOLONE DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

2-(3H)-OXAZOLONE DERIVATE

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX DERIVES DE 2-(3H)-OXAZOLONE

Publication

EP 1017685 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950000 A

Priority

  • EP 9805694 W
  • ES 9701928 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914205A1] A 2-(3H)-oxazolone compound of formula (I), wherein: R<1> is an alkyl or amino group; R<2> is a naphthyl, unsubstituted phenyl or phenyl group, substituted by from 1 to 3 halogen atoms or alkyl, alkoxy or trifluoromethyl groups; and R<3> is hydrogen or an alkyl group.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 263/38; A61K 31/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/421 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 11/08 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 263/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 263/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914205A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914205 A1 19990325; AR 017097 A1 20010822; AU 9623698 A 19990405; CO 5011110 A1 20010228; EP 1017685 A1 20000712; ES 2131015 A1 19990701; ES 2131015 B1 20000301; JP 2001516750 A 20011002; PE 116999 A1 19991213; UY 25179 A1 20001229; ZA 9808303 B 19990311

INPADOC legal status

2007-04-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025573

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALMIRALL PRODESFARMA, S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALMIRALL PRODESFARMA, S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000324;LT PAYMENT 20000324;LV PAYMENT 20000324;MK PAYMENT 20000324;RO PAYMENT 20000324;SI PAYMENT 20000324