Global Patent Index - EP 1017716 A4

EP 1017716 A4 2001-01-03 - CAR RECEPTORS AND RELATED MOLECULES AND METHODS

Title (en)

CAR RECEPTORS AND RELATED MOLECULES AND METHODS

Title (de)

CAR-REZEPTOREN, VERWANDTE MOLEKÜLE UND METHODEN

Title (fr)

RECEPTEURS CAR, MOLECULES ET PROCEDES APPARENTES

Publication

EP 1017716 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98944876 A

Priority

  • US 9819365 W
  • US 93438897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915555A1] Purified DNA encoding CAR receptors and the recombinant proteins expressed from such DNA are disclosed. The recombinant receptor polypeptides are used to identify CAR ligands and CAR receptor binding sites and are also used to produce therapeutics. Antibodies specific for CAR receptor polypeptides are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/435; C07K 14/705; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/72 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/72 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 9833819 A1 19980806 - UNIV NEW YORK [US]
  • [DX] DATABASE EMBL [online] 22 July 1997 (1997-07-22), CHOI H.S. ET AL.: "Mus musculus orphan nuclear hormone receptor isoform mCAR1 mRNA, complete cds.", XP002152126, Database accession no. AF009327 & HUENG-SIK CHOI ET AL.: "Differential transactivation by two isoforms of the orphan nuclear hormone receptor CAR", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 272, no. 38, 19 September 1997 (1997-09-19), MD US, pages 23565 - 23571, XP002152125HUENG-SIK CHOI ET AL.Differential transactivation by two isoforms of the orphan nuclear hormone receptor CARJOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRYMD US19970919272382356523571
  • [X] BAES, MYRIAM ET AL.: "A new orphan member of the nuclear hormone receptor superfamily that interacts with a subset of retinoic acid response elements", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 14, no. 3, March 1994 (1994-03-01), pages 1544 - 1552, XP000613954
  • [X] RICHARD P. TOMKO ET AL.: "HCAR and MCAR: The human and mouse cellular receptors for subgroup C adenoviruses and group B coxsackieviruses", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, vol. 94, April 1997 (1997-04-01), WASHINGTON US, pages 3352 - 3356, XP002911143
  • See also references of WO 9915555A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915555 A1 19990401; EP 1017716 A1 20000712; EP 1017716 A4 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031016

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-01-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE