Global patent index - EP 1017825 A1

EP 1017825 A1 2000-07-12 - METHODS OF IN SITU MODIFICATION OF PLANT GENES

Title (en)

METHODS OF IN SITU MODIFICATION OF PLANT GENES

Title (de)

METHODEN ZUR IN SITU-VERÄNDERUNG VON PFLANZENGENEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE MODIFICATION IN SITU DE PHYTOGENES

Publication

EP 1017825 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922954 A

Priority

  • GB 9801499 W
  • GB 9711015 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2326163A] A method of producing plants which exhibit an agronomically desirable trait comprises mutating or otherwise modifying in situ in a plant cell at least one gene and regenerating from a cell exhibiting the said trait fertile morphologically normal whole plants, and is characterised in that a polynucleotide is introduced into the plant cell, the said polynucleotide comprising at least one region which is substantially complementary to the gene, which gene when mutated or otherwise modified provides for the agronomically desirable trait, the region in the said polynucleotide containing at least one base mismatch in comparison with the like region in the said gene, so that the region in the said gene is altered by the DNA repair/replication system of the cell to include the said mismatch. The agronomically desirable trait may be herbicide resistance and specific mutations to the EPSPS and PDS genes are disclosed. The polynucleotide may contain RNA and DNA sequences and may have areas of heteroduplex, homoduplex and unpaired bases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/54; A01H 5/00; C12N 15/82; C12N 15/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01H 1/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 9/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/54 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01); C12N 15/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/1092 (2013.01); C12N 15/8213 (2013.01); C12N 15/8274 (2013.01); C12N 15/8275 (2013.01); C12N 15/8278 (2013.01); C12N 15/902 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9854330A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2326163 A 19981216; GB 9811138 D0 19980722; AU 7541498 A 19981230; EP 1017825 A1 20000712; GB 9711015 D0 19970723; JP 2002503101 A 20020129; WO 9854330 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status

2007-01-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060628

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALIGEN (US), INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991228

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE