Global Patent Index - EP 1017863 A1

EP 1017863 A1 2000-07-12 - METHODS FOR PRODUCING CONSTITUENT MEMBERS MADE OF AGEING-SENSITIVE STEEL AND COATED WITH BAKING ENAMEL

Title (en)

METHODS FOR PRODUCING CONSTITUENT MEMBERS MADE OF AGEING-SENSITIVE STEEL AND COATED WITH BAKING ENAMEL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON EINBRENNLACKIERTEN BAUTEILEN AUS ALTERUNGSEMPFINDLICHEM STAHL

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE PRODUCTION D'ELEMENTS CONSTITUTIFS EN ACIER SENSIBLE AU VIEILLISSEMENT, VERNIS AU VERNIS A CUIRE

Publication

EP 1017863 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943833 A

Priority

  • DE 19740148 A
  • EP 9804845 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914384A1] The present invention relates to methods for producing a bulge-resistant constituent member coated with baking enamel, wherein said member is made from a temper-pass cold-rolled strip (cold-rolled strip) of an ageing-sensitive steel having a high bake-hardening potential, in particular a bake-hardening potential of more than 70 N/mm<2>. This invention is characterised in that the cold-rolled strip is temper-passed in conditions of no apparent yielding point (Reh-Rel < 2 N/mm<2>) and stored at a temperature lower than the ambient temperature before being further submitted to a process for giving its shape to the constituent member. The strip is further coated with a baking enamel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/04; C21D 6/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/00 (2006.01); C21D 6/04 (2006.01); C21D 8/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 6/04 (2013.01); C21D 8/0436 (2013.01); C21D 8/0442 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914384A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914384 A1 19990325; AT 217356 T 20020515; DE 19740148 C1 19990715; EP 1017863 A1 20000712; EP 1017863 B1 20020508; ES 2177049 T3 20021201; JP 2001516807 A 20011002; US 6726786 B1 20040427

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030805

2004-08-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-05-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-03-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030804

2004-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *THYSSENKRUPP STAHL A.G.

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030826

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-08-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-08-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-08-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177049 T3

2002-10-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020917

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020819

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-19 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020819

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-08-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020814

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020813

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-08-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 217356 T 20020515

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000111

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE