Global Patent Index - EP 1017864 A1

EP 1017864 A1 2000-07-12 - ALLOY FOR PRODUCING METAL FOAMED BODIES USING A POWDER WITH NUCLEATING ADDITIVES

Title (en)

ALLOY FOR PRODUCING METAL FOAMED BODIES USING A POWDER WITH NUCLEATING ADDITIVES

Title (de)

LEGIERUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON METALLSCHAUMKÖRPERN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES PULVERS MIT KEIMBILDENDEN ZUSÄTZEN

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE DESTINE A LA PRODUCTION DE CORPS METALLIQUES EN MOUSSE A L'AIDE D'UNE POUDRE AYANT DES ADJUVANTS FORMANT DES GERMES

Publication

EP 1017864 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946304 A

Priority

  • DE 19737957 A
  • DE 19810979 A
  • EP 9805036 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6332907B1] The invention provides a metal alloy made from a metal matrix with added nucleating particles which causes uniform formation of bubbles and a homogenous foam structure. The invention also provides a method for producing metal foamed bodies including the following steps: producing a homogeneous mixture of at least one metal powder forming a metal matrix, a powder made of or made with nucleating particles causing uniform formation of bubbles and a homogenous foam structure, and at least one gas-generating gasifying agent powder; introducing the mixture into a mold or compacting the mixture under pressure, e.g., by cold or hot isostatic pressing, followed by hot forming, e.g., by extrusion or rolling, and optional further processing, e.g., by cold forming and/or machining; foaming by heating to a temperature above the temperature of decomposition of the gasifying agent, preferably inside the temperature range of the melting point of the metal used; and subsequent cooling of the body thus foamed. The invention also includes the use of a powder made of or with nucleating particles causing uniform formation of bubbles and a homogenous foam structure as an additive to a mixture consisting of at least one metal powder forming a metal matrix and at least one gas-generating gasifying agent powder in the production of metal foamed bodies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/08 (2006.01); B22F 3/11 (2006.01); B22F 3/115 (2006.01); C22C 1/04 (2006.01); C22C 1/10 (2006.01); C22C 21/02 (2006.01); C22C 32/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/043 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/0416 (2013.01); B22F 3/1125 (2013.01); B22F 3/115 (2013.01); C22C 1/1042 (2013.01); C22C 21/02 (2013.01); C22C 32/00 (2013.01); C22C 32/0063 (2013.01); C22F 1/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911832A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6332907 B1 20011225; AT 208435 T 20011115; EP 1017864 A1 20000712; EP 1017864 B1 20011107; ES 2167938 T3 20020516; JP 2001515140 A 20010918; JP 3823024 B2 20060920; WO 9911832 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120809

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802094

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120808

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120808

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120808

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120809

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120808

2013-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 208435 T

- Effective date: 20120808

2013-04-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-02-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59802094

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110825

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110825

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110831

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110829

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110822

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167938 T3

2002-03-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802094 20011213

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208435 T 20011115

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HONSEL GMBH & CO. KG

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE