Global Patent Index - EP 1017867 A1

EP 1017867 A1 2000-07-12 - ALUMINIUM BASED ALLOY AND METHOD FOR SUBJECTING IT TO HEAT TREATMENT

Title (en)

ALUMINIUM BASED ALLOY AND METHOD FOR SUBJECTING IT TO HEAT TREATMENT

Title (de)

LEGIERUNG AUF ALUMINIUMBASIS UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE A BASE D'ALUMINIUM ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LE SOUMETTRE A UN TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 1017867 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952615 A

Priority

  • EP 9806010 W
  • RU 97116302 A
  • RU 98104394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915708A1] The invention concerns an aluminium based alloy, in particular an Al-Li-Mg system alloy whereof the chemical composition expressed in percentage by mass is as follows: lithium, between 1.5 and 1.9; magnesium, between 4.1 and 6.0; zinc, between 0.1 and 1.5; zirconium, between 0.05 and 0.3; manganese, between 0.01 and 0.8; hydrogen between 0.9 x 10<-5> and 4.5 x 10<-5>. Said alloy contains at least an element selected in the following group: beryllium, between 0.001 and 0. 2; yttrium, between 0.01 and 0.5; scandium, between 0.01 and 0.3; the rest being constituted by aluminium. The invention further concerns a method for treating said alloy, comprising the following steps: hardening at a temperature from 400 to 500 DEG C in cold water or in open air; straightening with a constant degree of deformation of 0 to 2 %; gradual heat treatment, the first step being carried out at a temperature ranging between 80 and 90 DEG C, for 3 to 12 hours, the second step being carried out at a temperature ranging between 110 and 185 DEG C, for 10 to 48 hours. Once the second step retention time is completed, the third step, called age-hardening, is carried out. It consists in heating at a temperature ranging between 90 and 110 DEG C for 14 hours or slow cooling with a cooling speed of the order of 2 to 8 DEG C/h.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22F 1/04; C22C 21/00; C22C 21/06; C22F 1/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 21/00 (2006.01); C22C 21/06 (2006.01); C22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/04 (2006.01); C22F 1/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22F 1/04 (2013.01); C22C 21/00 (2013.01); C22C 21/06 (2013.01); C22F 1/047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915708A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915708 A1 19990401; WO 9915708 B1 19990603; AU 1025099 A 19990412; AU 759402 B2 20030417; BR 9812377 A 20000919; BR 9812377 B1 20110531; CA 2303595 A1 19990401; CA 2303595 C 20080506; CN 1084799 C 20020515; CN 1271393 A 20001025; EP 1017867 A1 20000712; EP 1017867 B1 20131106; ES 2445745 T3 20140305; JP 2001517735 A 20011009; JP 4185247 B2 20081126; US 2002056493 A1 20020516; US 6395111 B1 20020528; US 6461566 B2 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131106

2016-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140207

2015-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140921

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59814541

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2015-04-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140921

2015-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131106

2015-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59814541

2014-11-20 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59814541

- Effective date: 20140807

2014-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140807

2014-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131106

2014-08-07 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59814541

2014-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20140306

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131106

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131106

2014-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20131106

2014-03-12 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20131106

2014-03-05 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2445745 T3

- Effective date: 20140305

2014-02-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VIAM ALL RUSSIAN INSTITUT OF AVIATION MATERIALS

2014-02-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2014-01-02 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 59814541

- Effective date: 20140102

2013-12-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2013-12-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 639558 T

- Effective date: 20131215

2013-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2013-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2013-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2013-06-12 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130515

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PFANNENMUELLER, THOMAS

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOECHELT, ERWIN

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KHOKHLATOVA, LARISA BAGRATOVNA

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAVYDOV, VALENTIN GEORGIJEVICH

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TOLCHENNIKOVA, ELENA GLEBOVNA

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRIDLYANDER, IOSIF NAUMOVICH

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GALKIN, DMITRIJ SERGEJEVICH

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOLOBNEV,NIKOLAY IVANOVICH

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WINKLER, PETER-JUERGEN

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KABLOV, EVGENIJ NIKOLAJEVICH

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOZHAROVSKIJ, SERGEJ MIKHAJLOVICH

2013-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHERTOVIKOV, VLADIMIR MIKHAJLOVICH

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040219

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VIAM ALL RUSSIAN INSTITUT OF AVIATION MATERIALS

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE