Global Patent Index - EP 1017889 A1

EP 1017889 A1 2000-07-12 - INDUSTRIAL YARN PA 6.6 WITH LITTLE COTTON WASTE

Title (en)

INDUSTRIAL YARN PA 6.6 WITH LITTLE COTTON WASTE

Title (de)

FLUSENARMES PA 6.6 INDUSTRIEGARN

Title (fr)

FIL INDUSTRIEL PA 6.6 A FAIBLE DENSITE DE CHARPIE

Publication

EP 1017889 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97939933 A

Priority

  • CH 9700357 W
  • CH 86294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CH688554A5] The industrial PA 6.6 yarn has a total thickness of 900-2100 dtex, produced by a melt spinning process. The material is a polyamide 6.6 with a granulate viscosity of RV <= 75 and wound at a speed Vsp to meet the conditions: Vsp = (Fto / Ftx)<3> \* Vspo where Ft is the tensile strength, Fto=84 cN/tex, Ftx=the effective Ft in cN/tex and Vspo=2750 m/min., together with added water. The resulting PA 6.6 filament material has a tensile strength \-84 cN/tex and <= 1.5 fluffs/km.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915721A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

CH 688554 A5 19971114; EP 1017889 A1 20000712; EP 1017889 B1 20020227; WO 9915721 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050922

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030923

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-06-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030922

2004-05-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RHODIA INDUSTRIAL YARNS A.G.

- Effective date: 20030930

2004-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030923

2003-09-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030923

2003-09-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-09-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-02-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021128

2003-02-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030214

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-06 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030206

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020926

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-26 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020926

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-25 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020924

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020923

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020923

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020923

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020920

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2171995 T3

2002-09-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020913

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-08-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020823

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020521

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59706528 20020404

2002-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213789 T 20020315

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHODIA INDUSTRIAL YARNS AG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001121

2000-10-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AN INDUSTRIAL YARN PA 6.6 WITH LITTLE COTTON WASTE

2000-09-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AN INDUSTRIAL YARN PA 6.6 WITH LITTLE COTTON WASTE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE