Global Patent Index - EP 1017890 A1

EP 1017890 A1 2000-07-12 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING STRANDS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING STRANDS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VEREINZELN VON LITZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SEPARATION DES TORONS

Publication

EP 1017890 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98942441 A

Priority

  • CH 9800400 W
  • CH 223897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915723A1] The invention pertains to a method and device for separating strands suspended through grommets on support profiles to form a batch. According to said method and device, which device handles carefully and strains as little as possible the strands, for instance by preventing them from exposure to rubbing during the separation process and the subsequent transport away from the batch, the second to last strand (15, 16) of the bath is laterally offset into a strand area (11) and removed from the batch. The second to last strand is then removed to other areas in a direction away from the batch and, finally, conveyed by transport elements (12, 13) along the support profiles in the grommet (7) area, further from the batch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03J 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915723A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9915723 A1 19990401; AU 9059598 A 19990412; CA 2303806 A1 19990401; CN 1085262 C 20020522; CN 1271398 A 20001025; DE 59806650 D1 20030123; EP 1017890 A1 20000712; EP 1017890 B1 20021211; ES 2187057 T3 20030516; JP 2001517742 A 20011009; JP 3632189 B2 20050323; PT 1017890 E 20030430; TR 200000773 T2 20000721; TW 403797 B 20000901; US 6230377 B1 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090919

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090918

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090918

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100318

2010-03-29 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100318

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20080828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2005-12-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187057 T3

2003-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030225

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806650 20030123

2003-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEPARATING HEALDS

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020123

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT