Global Patent Index - EP 1017897 A1

EP 1017897 A1 2000-07-12 - FLUOROCHEMICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A BLOCKED ISOCYANATE EXTENDER AND METHOD OF TREATMENT OF A FIBROUS SUBSTRATE THEREWITH

Title (en)

FLUOROCHEMICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A BLOCKED ISOCYANATE EXTENDER AND METHOD OF TREATMENT OF A FIBROUS SUBSTRATE THEREWITH

Title (de)

FLUORIERTE VERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM STRECKMITTEL AUS BLOCKIERTEN ISOCYANATEN UND DIE METHODE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FASERSUBSTRATEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION FLUOROCHIMIQUE COMPRENANT UN DILUANT A BASE D'ISOCYANATE BLOQUE ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'UN SUBSTRAT FIBREUX A L'AIDE DE CELLE-CI

Publication

EP 1017897 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97945040 A

Priority

IB 9701354 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914422A1] The present invention provides a fluorochemical composition for treatment of a fibrous substrate. The fluorochemical composition comprises at least one fluorochemical compound and a blocked isocyanate extender derived from a condensation of a polyisocyanate, a diol selected from the group consisting of fatty ester diols, polysiloxane diols, polyester diols, polytetramethylene glycol, dimer diols and mixtures thereof and an isocyanate blocking agent. The present invention also provides a fibrous substrate treated with the above composition and the use of the above fluorochemical composition to impart water and/or oil repellency to a fibrous substrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06M 15/564; D06M 13/148; D06M 13/17; D06M 13/51; D06M 15/17; D06M 15/256; D06M 15/277; D06M 15/33; D06M 15/576; D06M 15/643

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 83/10 (2006.01); C08G 18/80 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/148 (2006.01); D06M 13/17 (2006.01); D06M 13/398 (2006.01); D06M 13/432 (2006.01); D06M 13/51 (2006.01); D06M 15/17 (2006.01); D06M 15/256 (2006.01); D06M 15/277 (2006.01); D06M 15/33 (2006.01); D06M 15/53 (2006.01); D06M 15/564 (2006.01); D06M 15/572 (2006.01); D06M 15/576 (2006.01); D06M 15/643 (2006.01); D06M 15/653 (2006.01); D06M 23/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06M 13/398 (2013.01); D06M 13/432 (2013.01); D06M 15/256 (2013.01); D06M 15/277 (2013.01); D06M 15/33 (2013.01); D06M 15/564 (2013.01); D06M 15/572 (2013.01); D06M 15/576 (2013.01); D06M 15/6436 (2013.01); D06M 15/653 (2013.01); D06M 23/10 (2013.01); D06M 2200/11 (2013.01); D06M 2200/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9914422A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914422 A1 19990325; AU 4634497 A 19990405; DE 69723480 D1 20030814; DE 69723480 T2 20040609; EP 1017897 A1 20000712; EP 1017897 B1 20030709; ID 20879 A 19990318; JP 2001516818 A 20011002; JP 4149658 B2 20080910

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090918

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090918

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090918

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MINNESOTA MINING AND MFG CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081009

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69723480

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-09 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL