Global Patent Index - EP 1017899 A4

EP 1017899 A4 2000-11-15 - TRANSITION-METAL SUBSTITUTED TUNGSTOALUMINATE COMPLEXES FOR DELIGNIFICATION AND WASTE MINERALIZATION

Title (en)

TRANSITION-METAL SUBSTITUTED TUNGSTOALUMINATE COMPLEXES FOR DELIGNIFICATION AND WASTE MINERALIZATION

Title (de)

MIT ÜBERGANGSMETALLEN SUBSTITUIERTE WOLFRAMALUMINAT-KOMPLEXE FÜR DELIGNIFIZIERUNG UND ABFALLMINERALISIERUNG

Title (fr)

COMPLEXES DE TUNGSTOALUMINATE SUBSTITUES PAR DES METAUX DE TRANSITION DESTINES A UNE DELIGNIFICATION ET UNE MINERALISATION DE DECHETS

Publication

EP 1017899 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98944749 A

Priority

  • US 9818462 W
  • US 5800097 P
  • US 14550498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911857A1] A method of delignifying lignocellulosic fibers is disclosed. In one embodiment, the method comprises the steps of combining a polyoxometalate complex with aluminum heteroatom of the formula [Al1VmMonWoNbpTaq(TM)rOs]<x-> where 1 is 1-6, m is 0-18, n is 0-40, o is 0-40, p is 0-10, q is 0-10, r is 0-9, and TM is a d-electron-containing transition metal ion, where l+m+n+o+p+q >/= 4, and s is sufficiently large that x > 0, with a lignocellulosic pulp, wherein the pH of the combination is between 6 and 11 and the consistency of the combination is 1-20 %; and heating the combination in a temperature-controlled and pressure-controlled vessel under conditions of temperature and time wherein the polyoxometalate is reduced and delignification occurs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/1063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911857 A1 19990311; AU 9221398 A 19990322; BR 9812135 A 20000718; CA 2301719 A1 19990311; EP 1017899 A1 20000712; EP 1017899 A4 20001115; JP 2003514127 A 20030415

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050323

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041112

2000-11-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR PT SE

2000-11-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000229

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR PT SE