Global Patent Index - EP 1017906 A1

EP 1017906 A1 2000-07-12 - RAIL SYSTEM

Title (en)

RAIL SYSTEM

Title (de)

SCHIENENANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RAILS

Publication

EP 1017906 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951252 A

Priority

  • DE 9802570 W
  • DE 19742544 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19839907A1] A rail arrangement (1) comprises of a rail section with fixing members, sleepers (2) made of wood, concrete etc., a surface which supports the sleepers, and a shoe (4) for the sleepers, which is made of an elastomer. The side walls (7) of the shoe broaden out with height, and the shoe surrounds the sleeper partially or completely. The side wall of the shoe has a rib and groove system (8) on its inside. The base of the shoe has an elastic insert (5) which contains channels (6). The channels lie in a single plane and have two different geometries. The elastic insert preferably consists of EPDM.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 1/005 (2013.01); E01B 2204/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916976A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19839907 A1 19990401; AT 256787 T 20040115; AU 740190 B2 20011101; AU 9735998 A 19990423; CA 2304691 A1 19990408; CN 1269856 A 20001011; DK 1017906 T3 20040301; EP 1017906 A1 20000712; EP 1017906 B1 20031217; ES 2212355 T3 20040716; JP 2001518580 A 20011016; PT 1017906 E 20040430; US 6283383 B1 20010904; WO 9916976 A1 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160916

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160302

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-03-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20160302

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140901

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140303

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810480

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-04-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120928

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120930

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060902

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PHOENIX AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Free text: PHOENIX AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#HANNOVERSCHE STRASSE 88#21079 HAMBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- PHOENIX AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#HANNOVERSCHE STRASSE 88#21079 HAMBURG (DE)

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060902

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-04-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-09-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060903

2005-09-09 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050909

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-05 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050905

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-10-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212355 T3

2004-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040308

2004-03-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040211

2004-03-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-02-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810480 P 20040129

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-09-06 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990714

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE