Global Patent Index - EP 1017916 A1

EP 1017916 A1 2000-07-12 - METHOD FOR ALLOCATING A REMOTE CONTROL TO A BASE STATION

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ALLOCATING A REMOTE CONTROL TO A BASE STATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ZUORDNEN EINER FERNBEDIENUNG ZU EINER BASISSTATION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'AFFECTATION D'UNE TELECOMMANDE A UNE STATION DE BASE

Publication

EP 1017916 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98958152 A

Priority

  • DE 9802808 W
  • DE 19742495 A
  • DE 19841514 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916989A1] The invention relates to a method for allocating a remote control to a base station. The base station (10) transmits a search signal (108), whereupon the remote control (20) re-transmits a contact signal (102) if the search signal matches a stored reference signal. Once the contact signal has been inputted, the base station (10) sends a variable activation signal for each allocation in order to verify remote control (20) affiliation. The variable activation signal, which is already determined (36) before the search signal is transmitted by the base station and stored, is retrieved for said allocation only.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00111 (2013.01); G07C 9/00015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916989A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916989 A1 19990408; AU 1432599 A 19990423; AU 730422 B2 20010308; EP 1017916 A1 20000712; EP 1017916 B1 20040414; ES 2219920 T3 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070922

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050913

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060923

2007-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060923

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060922

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060922

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060923

2005-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050920

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050913

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219920 T3

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040722

2004-08-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811205 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE