Global Patent Index - EP 1017919 A1

EP 1017919 A1 2000-07-12 - SLIDING ROD CLOSURE FOR A CABINET DOOR HINGED ON A SWITCH CABINET BODY

Title (en)

SLIDING ROD CLOSURE FOR A CABINET DOOR HINGED ON A SWITCH CABINET BODY

Title (de)

SCHUBSTANGENVERSCHLUSS FÜR EINE AN EINEM SCHALTSCHRANK-KORPUS ANGELENKTE SCHRANKTÜRE

Title (fr)

FERMETURE A TIGE COULISSANTE DESTINEE A UNE PORTE ARTICULEE A UN CORPS D'ARMOIRE ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1017919 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954275 A

Priority

  • DE 19742511 A
  • EP 9805815 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19742511A1] The invention relates to a sliding rod closure for a cabinet door (60) hinged on a switch cabinet body comprising a locking mechanism which has an actuating member (40), said member being displaceable in the direction of rotation. The actuating member (40) is coupled to a sliding unit (20), whereby said sliding unit (20) has a spaced adjusting member situated perpendicular to the sliding direction of the rotational axis of the actuating member (40). The adjusting member (23) can be operated by the actuating member. The sliding rod closure can be used to meet various requirements thus resulting in an easier operation thereof. The invention is characterized in that the adjusting member (23) can be assigned to the actuating member (40) in a variety of assembly positions, whereby the sliding direction of the sliding unit (20) is maintained in various assembly positions. However, the direction of rotation of the actuating member (40) is modified or the sliding direction of the sliding unit (20) is also modified, and the direction of rotation of the actuating member (40) is maintained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/02; E05B 65/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/12 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/021 (2013.01); E05B 63/04 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5097 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1018 (2015.04); Y10T 292/307 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916994A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19742511 A1 19990401; DE 19742511 C2 20020725; AT 255199 T 20031215; AU 1146499 A 19990423; AU 730175 B2 20010301; BR 9812390 A 20000912; CN 1154781 C 20040623; CN 1306599 A 20010801; CZ 20001018 A3 20010815; CZ 297872 B6 20070418; EP 1017919 A1 20000712; EP 1017919 B1 20031126; ES 2212365 T3 20040716; HU 0004016 A2 20010328; HU 0004016 A3 20011029; HU 228075 B1 20121029; JP 2001518586 A 20011016; KR 100399289 B1 20030926; PL 188351 B1 20050131; PL 339698 A1 20010102; RU 2000110623 A 20040327; RU 2167987 C1 20010527; US 6485067 B1 20021126; WO 9916994 A1 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212365 T3

2004-03-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-02-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT NL SE

2003-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT NL SE