Global patent index - EP 1017922 A1

EP 1017922 A1 2000-07-12 - A ROLL-UP DOOR

Title (en)

A ROLL-UP DOOR

Title (de)

ROLLTÜR

Title (fr)

PORTE A RIDEAU METALLIQUE

Publication

EP 1017922 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946263 A

Priority

  • DK 9800418 W
  • DK 110697 A
  • DK 120398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916997A1] A roll-up door (1) is assembled by a number of preferably elongated sections (16', 16") each comprising a front (22', 22"), a back (23', 23"), and two edge sides (24', 24") extending transversely of the door. The sections are two by two pivotally connected by hinges (20) at adjacent edge sides. These edge sides are arranged in such a way that they are supporting against each other along a front and a posterior pair of supporting surfaces (25', 25") at the front and the back respectively of the sections in the closed position, and that they between these supporting surfaces are extending at a relatively small mutual distance over a predetermined arc angle along a front pair of mainly cylindrical flanks (27', 27") having mutual axes with or nearly mutual axes with the pivot axis and a posterior pair of flanks (28', 28"). The door is made secure against getting the fingers caught both at the front and at the back, and its sections are supported securely and stably during mounting. In the closed position, the hinges are effectively relieved of load, and the heat loss via the joint between the sections is reduced to a minimum.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/485 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916997A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916997 A1 19990408; AT 216024 T 20020415; AU 9338098 A 19990423; DE 69804828 D1 20020516; DE 69804828 T2 20021010; DK 1017922 T3 20020729; EP 1017922 A1 20000712; EP 1017922 B1 20020410; ES 2173620 T3 20021016; NO 20001565 A 20000324; NO 20001565 D0 20000324; NO 318332 B1 20050307; PL 192387 B1 20061031; PL 339433 A1 20001218; PT 1017922 E 20020731

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160920

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150910

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150909

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150909

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150914

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150914

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150911

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150921

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150909

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-02-27 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: NEW ADDRESS: VIA LUGANETTO 3, 6962 LUGANO (CH)

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030113

2003-04-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2173620

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-26 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020402208

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-09-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020507

2002-07-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69804828

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-16

2002-05-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.P.A.

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 216024

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FABECH-LARSEN, JAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: SECTIONAL OVERHEAD DOOR

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010726

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE