Global Patent Index - EP 1017936 A1

EP 1017936 A1 2000-07-12 - SILENCER WITH A BYPASS RESONATOR

Title (en)

SILENCER WITH A BYPASS RESONATOR

Title (de)

SCHALLDÄMPFER MIT EINEM NEBENSCHLUSSRESONATOR

Title (fr)

SILENCIEUX AVEC RESONATEUR A FLUX PARTIEL

Publication

EP 1017936 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948914 A

Priority

  • DE 19743482 A
  • EP 9805636 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19743482A1] A silencer is disclosed with a bypass resonator (4; 9, 12) connected by at least one tubular connection (3a, 3b; 7, 8; 13) to a sound-transmitting channel (1). The tubular connection (3a, 3b) can have various lengths (La, Lb), tubular connections (7, 8) of different thicknesses can be connected, or the volume (V1, V2, Vn) of the bypass resonator (13) can be variable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/12; F01N 1/02; F01N 1/16; G10K 11/172

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/02 (2006.01); F01N 1/16 (2006.01); F02M 35/12 (2006.01); G10K 11/172 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/023 (2013.01); F01N 1/02 (2013.01); F01N 1/166 (2013.01); F02M 35/1222 (2013.01); F02M 35/1261 (2013.01); G10K 11/172 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917012A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT MC

EPO simple patent family

DE 19743482 A1 19990408; EP 1017936 A1 20000712; EP 1017936 B1 20040225; JP 2001518593 A 20011016; US 6494290 B1 20021217; WO 9917012 A1 19990408; ZA 9808634 B 19990326

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810857

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810857

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MANN + HUMMEL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MANN + HUMMEL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810857 P 20040401

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT MC

2004-02-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANN + HUMMEL GMBH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT MC