Global Patent Index - EP 1017944 A1

EP 1017944 A1 2000-07-12 - COMPOUND PUMP

Title (en)

COMPOUND PUMP

Title (de)

COMPOUNDPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE COMPOUND

Publication

EP 1017944 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954252 A

Priority

  • DE 29717079 U
  • EP 9805611 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6422829B1] The invention relates to a friction vacuum pump (1) containing at least one turbomolecular pump stage (6, 7), a screw pump stage (11, 12) connected to the delivery side of the pump, and a filling stage (24) arranged between the turbomolecular pump stage (6, 7) and the screw pump stage (11, 12). According to the invention it is proposed that said filling stage (24) be configured as a centrifugal stage in order to simplify the construction thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/168 (2013.01); F04D 19/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9915793A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29717079 U1 19971106; EP 1017944 A1 20000712; EP 1017944 B1 20030625; JP 2001517757 A 20011009; US 6422829 B1 20020723; WO 9915793 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-12-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808840

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000120

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT