Global Patent Index - EP 1017944 B1

EP 1017944 B1 2003-06-25 - COMPOUND PUMP

Title (en)

COMPOUND PUMP

Title (de)

COMPOUNDPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE COMPOUND

Publication

EP 1017944 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98954252 A

Priority

  • DE 29717079 U
  • EP 9805611 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9915793A1] The invention relates to a friction vacuum pump (1) containing at least one turbomolecular pump step (6, 7), a screw pump step (11, 12) connected to the delivery side of the pump, and a filling step (24) arranged between the turbomolecular pump step (6, 7) and the screw pump step (11, 12). According to the invention, said filling step (24) is configured as a centrifugal step in order to simplify the construction thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 17/168 (2013.01); F04D 19/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29717079 U1 19971106; EP 1017944 A1 20000712; EP 1017944 B1 20030625; JP 2001517757 A 20011009; US 6422829 B1 20020723; WO 9915793 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2003-12-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808840 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000120

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT