Global Patent Index - EP 1017971 A1

EP 1017971 A1 2000-07-12 - A COMPENSATED CAPACITIVE LIQUID LEVEL SENSOR

Title (en)

A COMPENSATED CAPACITIVE LIQUID LEVEL SENSOR

Title (de)

KOMPENSIERTER KAPAZITIVER FLÜSSIGKEITSSTANDSAUFNEHMER

Title (fr)

DETECTEUR DE NIVEAU DE LIQUIDE A EFFET CAPACITIF COMPENSE

Publication

EP 1017971 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98942217 A

Priority

  • US 9817477 W
  • US 91718797 A
  • US 11837198 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01F 23/26; G01R 27/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01C 9/06 (2006.01); G01C 9/20 (2006.01); G01F 23/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01F 23/268 (2013.01); G01C 9/06 (2013.01); G01C 9/20 (2013.01); G01F 23/266 (2013.01); G01C 2009/062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

AU 9032198 A 19990316; EP 1017971 A1 20000712; EP 1017971 A4 20060920

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080115

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070903

2006-09-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060821

2004-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: YISHAY SENSORS LTD.

2004-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TAMAR SENSORS LTD.

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT