Global Patent Index - EP 1017982 A1

EP 1017982 A1 2000-07-12 - APPARATUS FOR REMOVING A SAMPLE FROM AN ARRAY OF SAMPLES AND A CUTTING TOOL FOR USE WITH THAT APPARATUS

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR REMOVING A SAMPLE FROM AN ARRAY OF SAMPLES AND A CUTTING TOOL FOR USE WITH THAT APPARATUS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG EINER PROBE AUS EINER PROBENMATRIX UND SCHNEIDEVERKZEUG ZUM GEBRAUCH MIT DIESER VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SORTIR UN ECHANTILLON D'UN ENSEMBLE D'ECHANTILLONS ET OUTIL COUPANT POUR LEDIT DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1017982 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98946150 A

Priority

  • AU 9800813 W
  • AU PO943897 A
  • AU PO361598 A

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 1/08; B26D 5/34; B26D 7/18; G01N 1/04; G01N 35/10; G06F 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/34 (2006.01); B26D 7/18 (2006.01); G01N 1/04 (2006.01); G01N 1/08 (2006.01); G01N 35/10 (2006.01); G06F 19/00 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1017982 A1 20000712; EP 1017982 A4 20041006

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060819

2004-11-10 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RA4

- Effective date: 20040928

2004-10-27 [DA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: DA4

2004-10-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20040816

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000420;LT PAYMENT 20000420;LV PAYMENT 20000420;MK PAYMENT 20000420;RO PAYMENT 20000420;SI PAYMENT 20000420