Global Patent Index - EP 1018062 A1

EP 1018062 A1 2000-07-12 - IMPROVEMENTS IN AUTOMATED FLUID FLOW SYSTEMS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN AUTOMATED FLUID FLOW SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN IN AUTOMATISCHEN FLUIDSTRÖMUNGSSYSTEMEN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES AUX SYSTEMES AUTOMATISES D'ECOULEMENT FLUIDIQUE

Publication

EP 1018062 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98943571 A

Priority

  • AU 9800775 W
  • AU PO925497 A
  • AU PP031197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9914647A1] Accordingly to a first invention, there is provided a control device for an automated fluid flow system which includes an overriding device for enabling or disabling the automated fluid flow system in which a transmitter emits signals and reception of reflected signals by a receiver is used to initiate perdetermined actions which overriding device comprises: (a) light sensing means to measure the amount of light at or adjacent to the automated system; (b) comparison means to compare the amount of light measured by the light sensing means to at least one predetermined threshold amount of light and in response to such comparison initiate an enabling signal if the threshold amount has been exceeded or a disabling signal if the threshold amount has not been exceeded; and (c) overriding means to receive the enabling signal and cause the automated system to be enabled and to receive the disabling signal and cause the automated system to be disabled.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 7/06; E03C 1/05; E03D 5/10; F16K 31/02; G01J 1/32; G01V 8/12; G05D 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/05 (2006.01); G01J 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01J 1/32 (2013.01); E03C 1/057 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9914647 A1 19990325; CA 2304091 A1 19990325; EP 1018062 A1 20000712; EP 1018062 A4 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020625

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-05-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 05D 7/06 A, 7G 05D 25/02 B, 7E 03C 1/05 B, 7E 03D 5/10 B, 7F 16K 31/02 B, 7G 01J 1/32 B, 7G 01V 8/12 B, 7G 05D 23/13 B

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE