Global Patent Index - EP 1018064 A1

EP 1018064 A1 2000-07-12 - SOLID-STATE HIGH VOLTAGE LINEAR REGULATOR CIRCUIT

Title (en)

SOLID-STATE HIGH VOLTAGE LINEAR REGULATOR CIRCUIT

Title (de)

LINEARE HOCHSPANNUNGSHALBLEITERREGLERSCHALTUNG

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT REGULATEUR LINEAIRE HAUTE TENSION A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS

Publication

EP 1018064 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 96935908 A

Priority

US 9615200 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9812613A1] A regulator circuit (10, 50) for connection to a high voltage generator (16, 52). The regulator circuit may be coupled to the generator in either a series or a shunt configuration. In the shunt configuration, the regulator circuit (10) varies the amount of current through a shunt resistor (R1) to change the output voltage provided to a load. The amount of current that is shunted by the regulator circuit is controlled by a feedback circuit consisting of a voltage divider (20) and an error amplifier (22). In the series configuration, the voltage across the regulator circuit (50) is added to the output from the high voltage generator. The current conducted through the regulator circuit therefore varies the summed output provided to the load.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 1/10; G05F 1/613; G05F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/56 (2006.01); G05F 1/613 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/56 (2013.01); G05F 1/613 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9812613 A1 19980326; AU 7243296 A 19980414; DE 69634919 D1 20050811; DE 69634919 T2 20060518; EP 1018064 A1 20000712; EP 1018064 A4 20000712; EP 1018064 B1 20050706

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69634919

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120923

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120923

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120923

2013-04-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120924

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110921

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110913

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110921

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-09-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-08-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69634919

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-07-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990417

2000-07-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19991112

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE