Global Patent Index - EP 1018096 A1

EP 1018096 A1 2000-07-12 - ROLL STORAGE SYSTEM FOR SHEET-SHAPED OBJECTS

Title (en)

ROLL STORAGE SYSTEM FOR SHEET-SHAPED OBJECTS

Title (de)

ROLLENSPEICHER FÜR BLATTFÖRMIGE GEGENSTÄNDE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RESERVE A ROULEAUX POUR OBJETS EN FORME DE FEUILLE

Publication

EP 1018096 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941273 A

Priority

  • DE 9801856 W
  • DE 19732129 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19732129A1] The invention relates to a roll storage system for sheet-shaped objects, especially banknotes, with a housing (10). A supply roll (12) for a storage film (20) and a storage roll (14) are mounted in said housing (10) in such a way that they can turn, said storage roll being connected to said storage film. The supply roll (12) and the storage roll (14) are each coupled with a roll drive mechanism. The storage film (20) is guided between the supply roll (12) and the storage roll (14) via at least one guiding roll (26, 28, 29). The inventive system also comprises a guide device (34) for guiding sheet-shaped objects into or out of the reel (24) of the storage roll (12), consisting of a conveyor table (34) which is able to swivel around a swivel pin (38) fixed to the housing (10) and which can be displaced parallel to the direction of conveyance (B). A transfer conveyor (48) for introducing sheet-shaped objects into the reel (24) and removing sheet-shaped objects from the reel (24) of the storage roll (14) is also arranged on the conveyor table (34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 1/00; G07D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/28 (2006.01); B65H 29/00 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 11/0006 (2013.01); B65H 5/28 (2013.01); B65H 29/006 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4191 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9905652A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19732129 A1 19990128; EP 1018096 A1 20000712; EP 1018096 B1 20020403; ES 2175756 T3 20021116; US 7293735 B1 20071113; WO 9905652 A1 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2013-05-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130531

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110703

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110703

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110703

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100802

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-12-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-03-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030106

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2175756

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-10-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-09-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803656

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-08

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010723

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF GMBH & CO KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI