Global patent index - EP 1018106 A1

EP 1018106 A1 2000-07-12 - DISPLAY DEVICE

Title (en)

DISPLAY DEVICE

Title (de)

ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE

Publication

EP 1018106 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97942111 A

Priority

  • GB 9702619 W
  • GB 9619977 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9813813A1] A display device for use on a moving vehicle, said display device comprising: (i) a flexible, inflatable tube with a mouth and a tail end, said tube being adapted such that air currents can flow through the tube and in doing so cause the tube to inflate; (ii) a reinforced collar region around the mouth of the tube; (iii) a first attachment means being an integral part of or adapted to attach to a vehicle; (iv) a second attachment means adapted to attach the collar region of the tube to the first attachment means on the motor vehicle; and wherein the sides of the tube are adapted to display advertising or other display material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 21/04; G09F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 17/00 (2006.01); G09F 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 17/00 (2013.01); G09F 21/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9813813A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9813813 A1 19980402; AU 4390897 A 19980417; EP 1018106 A1 20000712; EP 1018106 B1 20030416; GB 2318674 A 19980429; GB 2318674 B 20000809; GB 9619977 D0 19961113; GB 9720468 D0 19971126

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150925

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150925

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141128

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-04-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-07-17 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69721075

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-04-16 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-04-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT