Global Patent Index - EP 1018129 A1

EP 1018129 A1 2000-07-12 - ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNETIC RELAY

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHES RELAIS

Title (fr)

RELAIS ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1018129 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936088 A

Priority

  • DE 9801508 W
  • DE 19727863 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19727863C1] The invention relates to an electromagnetic relay containing a base body (1) consisting of insulating material, an armature (21), said armature being located above said base body (1) in such a way that it can pivot, a contact spring device which is rigidly connected to the armature (21) by a covering (27) consisting of insulating material, a coil (3) and a core (31), said core being positioned axially in said coil. Two transversal torsion spring pins (25) extend out of the covering (27) in the area of the rotational axis of the armature. Said torsion spring pins (25) are aligned with their plate level perpendicular to the base level, said base level being determined by the floor of the base body (1), and are each attached to a middle contact connecting pin (12). Said middle contact connecting pin (12) projects out from the base body (1), perpendicularly to the base level.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/18 (2006.01); H01H 51/22 (2006.01); H01H 51/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 51/2281 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9901882A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19727863 C1 19990121; CA 2294876 A1 19990114; CN 1261983 A 20000802; EP 1018129 A1 20000712; EP 1018129 B1 20010808; JP 2002507317 A 20020305; TW 380270 B 20000121; US 6140895 A 20001031; WO 9901882 A1 19990114

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-01-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030603

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-06-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021230

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020605

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020501

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801191 20010913

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-08-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010808

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT