Global patent index - EP 1018131 A1

EP 1018131 A1 2000-07-12 - GATED ELECTRON EMISSION DEVICE AND METHOD OF FABRICATION THEREOF

Title (en)

GATED ELECTRON EMISSION DEVICE AND METHOD OF FABRICATION THEREOF

Title (de)

GITTERGESTEUERTE ELEKTRONENEMISSIONSVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF EMETTEUR D'ELECTRONS A GRILLE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1018131 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97926809 A

Priority

  • US 9709196 W
  • US 66053796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9747020A1] A gated electron-emitter is fabricated by a process in which particles (26) are deposited over an insulating layer (24). Gate material is provided over the insulating layer in the space between the particles after which the particles and any overlying material are removed. The remaining gate material forms a gate layer (28A or 48A) through which gate openings (30 or 50) extend at the locations of the removed particles. When the gate material deposition is performed so that part of the gate material extends into the spaces below the particles, the gate openings are beveled. The insulating layer is etched through the gate openings to form dielectric openings (32 or 52). Electron-emissive elements (36A or 56A) are formed in the dielectric openings. This typically involves introducing emitter material through the gate openings into the dielectric openings and using a lift-off layer (34), or an electrochemical technique, to remove excess emitter material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 1/304 (2006.01); H01J 9/02 (2006.01); H01J 29/04 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/025 (2013.01); H01J 2329/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9747020 A1 19971211; DE 69740027 D1 20101202; EP 1018131 A1 20000712; EP 1018131 A4 20000719; EP 1018131 B1 20101020; JP 2001506395 A 20010515; JP 3736857 B2 20060118; KR 20000016557 A 20000325; TW 398005 B 20000711; US 5865657 A 19990202

INPADOC legal status

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140605

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69740027

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140605

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69740027

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120229

2011-11-17 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 69740027

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110721

2011-09-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20110721

2011-01-21 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1030477

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2010-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69740027

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2010-12-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2010-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2010-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-04-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030128

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CANDESCENT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-07-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01J 1/30 A, 7H 01J 9/02 B

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990107

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB