Global patent index - EP 1018138 A1

EP 1018138 A1 2000-07-12 - SCANNING EVANESCENT ELECTRO-MAGNETIC MICROSCOPE

Title (en)

SCANNING EVANESCENT ELECTRO-MAGNETIC MICROSCOPE

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE QUERGEDÄMPTE WELLEN- RASTERMIKROSKOP

Title (fr)

MICROSCOPE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE EVANESCENT A BALAYAGE

Publication

EP 1018138 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98953178 A

Priority

  • US 9819764 W
  • US 5947197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916102A1] A scanning microscope uses near-field evanescent electromagnetic waves emitted from a sharpened metal tip (20) to probe sample (80) properties. The sharpened tip (20), which is electrically and mechanically connected to a central electrode (18), extends through and beyond an aperture (22) in an endwall (16) of a microwave resonating device, such as a microwave cavity resonator (10). The microscope is capable of high resolution imaging and quantitative measurement of the electrical properties of a sample, such as the dielectric constant, tangent loss, conductivity, and complex electrical impedance measurements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 37/20; G01B 7/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/30 (2006.01); G01Q 60/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01Q 60/22 (2013.01); B82Y 20/00 (2013.01); B82Y 35/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916102 A1 19990401; AU 1061599 A 19990412; EP 1018138 A1 20000712; EP 1018138 A4 20001220; JP 2001517804 A 20011009; JP 4431273 B2 20100310

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040629

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020206

2000-12-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01N 27/00 A, 7G 01B 7/34 B, 7H 01J 37/20 B

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE