Global Patent Index - EP 1018138 A4

EP 1018138 A4 2000-12-20 - SCANNING EVANESCENT ELECTRO-MAGNETIC MICROSCOPE

Title (en)

SCANNING EVANESCENT ELECTRO-MAGNETIC MICROSCOPE

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE QUERGEDÄMPTE WELLEN- RASTERMIKROSKOP

Title (fr)

MICROSCOPE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE EVANESCENT A BALAYAGE

Publication

EP 1018138 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98953178 A

Priority

  • US 9819764 W
  • US 5947197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916102A1] A scanning microscope uses near-field evanescent electromagnetic waves emitted from a sharpened metal tip (20) to probe sample (80) properties. The sharpened tip (20), which is electrically and mechanically connected to a central electrode (18), extends through and beyond an aperture (22) in an endwall (16) of a microwave resonating device, such as a microwave cavity resonator (10). The microscope is capable of high resolution imaging and quantitative measurement of the electrical properties of a sample, such as the dielectric constant, tangent loss, conductivity, and complex electrical impedance measurements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/00; G01B 7/34; H01J 37/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/30 (2006.01); G01Q 60/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01Q 60/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XAY] MASSOOD TABIB-AZAR ET AL: "NON-DESTRUCTIVE CHARACTERIZATION OF MATERIALS BY EVANESCENT MICROWAVES", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY,GB,IOP PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, vol. 4, no. 5, 1 May 1993 (1993-05-01), pages 583 - 590, XP000362377, ISSN: 0957-0233
  • [DXAY] WEI T ET AL: "Scanning tip microwave near-field microscope", APPL. PHYS. LETT., vol. 68, no. 24, 10 June 1996 (1996-06-10), pages 1 - 3, XP002917072
  • [DY] FEE M ET AL: "Scanning electromagnetic transmission line micriscope with sub-wavelength resolution", OPTICS COMM., vol. 69, no. 3,4, 1 January 1989 (1989-01-01), pages 219 - 224, XP000885387
  • [DYA] POZAR, DAVID M: "MICROWAVE ENGINEERING", 1990, ADDISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING COMPANY, READING, MASSACHUSETTS, XP002149688
  • [PX] GAO C ET AL: "HIGH SPATIAL RESOLUTION QUANTITATIVE MICROWAVE IMPEDANCE MICROSCOPYBY A SCANNING TIP MICROWAVE NEAR-FIELD MICROSCOPE", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS,US,AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, vol. 71, no. 13, 29 September 1997 (1997-09-29), XP000725818, ISSN: 0003-6951
  • See also references of WO 9916102A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916102 A1 19990401; AU 1061599 A 19990412; EP 1018138 A1 20000712; EP 1018138 A4 20001220; JP 2001517804 A 20011009; JP 4431273 B2 20100310

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040629

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2000-12-20 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001108

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01N 27/00 A, 7G 01B 7/34 B, 7H 01J 37/20 B

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE