Global Patent Index - EP 1018191 A1

EP 1018191 A1 2000-07-12 - LOW VOLTAGE PLUG ADAPTER WITH ORGANISING REAR BONNET

Title (en)

LOW VOLTAGE PLUG ADAPTER WITH ORGANISING REAR BONNET

Title (de)

SCHWACHSTROMSTECKER MIT ORGANISATIONS-RÜCKVERSCHLUSSKAPPE

Title (fr)

PRISE DE COURANT FAIBLE A CAPUCHON ARRIERE ORGANISATEUR

Publication

EP 1018191 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98944021 A

Priority

  • FR 9802004 W
  • FR 9711763 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2768862A1] The detachable cover (1) has wire guide sections and wiring connections at right angles to the direction of pull allowing easier wiring connection and correct positioning away from the base unit and easily pluggable to the base section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/658; H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/658 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2433 (2013.01); H01R 13/6589 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916153A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2768862 A1 19990326; FR 2768862 B1 19991224; AU 9170498 A 19990412; BR 9812496 A 20000926; DE 69805823 D1 20020711; DE 69805823 T2 20030123; DK 1018191 T3 20020930; EP 1018191 A1 20000712; EP 1018191 B1 20020605; ES 2178255 T3 20021216; US 6267617 B1 20010731; WO 9916153 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080919

2010-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080919

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080918

2009-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080919

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080918

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080918

2009-05-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INFRA +

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070915

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070817

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070820

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070920

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-09-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070910

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070823

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178255 T3

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-09-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69805823 20020711

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE