Global Patent Index - EP 1018196 A1

EP 1018196 A1 2000-07-12 - A SEMICONDUCTOR LASER DIODE BAR ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

A SEMICONDUCTOR LASER DIODE BAR ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

HALBLEITERLASERSTAB BAUGRUPPE

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE BARREAU POUR DIODE LASER A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 1018196 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98942918 A

Priority

  • GB 9802782 W
  • GB 9720376 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2329758A] A semiconductor laser diode bar assembly comprises a plurality of sub-assemblies 1a,1 b each including a copper base plate 2a,2b in which is mounted a plurality of heat pipes 3, for distributing heat within the base plate from a region under a diode bar 4a,4b mounted to the base plate. The sub-assemblies 1a,1b are releasably mounted on a common heat sink 7 and may be electrically isolated from said heat sink by electrically insulating layer 11. Incorporation of the heat pipes into the base plate of each sub-assembly, which base plate forms an electrode for the diode bar, results in more efficient cooling of the diode bar 4. The other electrode of the diode bar may be provided by a conductive layer 6. The heart sink 7 may include a Peltier cooling device and a thermocouple.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 3/25; H01S 3/0941; H01S 3/043

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/024 (2006.01); H01S 5/40 (2006.01); H01S 3/0941 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01S 5/4025 (2013.01); H01S 3/0941 (2013.01); H01S 5/02264 (2013.01); H01S 5/02272 (2013.01); H01S 5/02415 (2013.01); H01S 5/02469 (2013.01); H01S 5/0425 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9917411A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

GB 2329758 A8 19990629; GB 2329758 A 19990331; GB 2329758 B 19990825; GB 9819708 D0 19981104; CA 2304859 A1 19990408; EP 1018196 A1 20000712; GB 9720376 D0 19971126; IL 135213 D0 20010520; JP 2001518722 A 20011016; WO 9917411 A1 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-08-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAE SYSTEMS AVIONICS LIMITED

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAE SYSTEMS AVIONICS LIMITED

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01S 5/40 A, 7H 01S 3/0941 B, 7H 01S 5/024 B

2000-10-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: A SEMICONDUCTOR LASER DIODE BAR ASSEMBLY

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB