Global Patent Index - EP 1018239 A1

EP 1018239 A1 2000-07-12 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSIENT KEY DIGITAL TIME STAMPS

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSIENT KEY DIGITAL TIME STAMPS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ZEITSTEMPELN MITTELS ÜBERGANGSSCHLÜSSELN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR HORODATEURS NUMERIQUES A CLES TRANSITOIRES

Publication

EP 1018239 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98949485 A

Priority

  • US 9820036 W
  • US 5945597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916209A1] Irrefutable public key digital signature time-stamps (1040) are created and used based upon, for example, the concept of transient time-interval-related secret cryptographic keys (2010), which are used to digitally sign (2030) submitted data during specific time intervals, and then permanently destroyed (2040). The public-key correlate for each time interval is saved for future authentication of the content of time-stamped data and time of creation of time-stamped data. The validity of the public keys is ensured through the certification of each time interval's public key using the previous time interval's secret key, immediately before that secret key is destroyed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09C 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 63/0823 (2013.01); H04L 9/3247 (2013.01); H04L 9/3297 (2013.01); H04L 63/12 (2013.01); H04L 2209/38 (2013.01); H04L 2209/60 (2013.01); H04L 2463/121 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916209 A1 19990401; AU 760742 B2 20030522; AU 760742 C 20061109; AU 9579698 A 19990412; CA 2304342 A1 19990401; CA 2304342 C 20090127; EP 1018239 A1 20000712; EP 1018239 A4 20050713; IL 135069 D0 20010520; JP 2001517818 A 20011009; JP 2010148098 A 20100701; JP 4563577 B2 20101013

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120403

2007-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DFS LINKAGES, INC.

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060718

2005-07-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-07-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 9/32 A

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROOFSPACE, INC.

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL