Global Patent Index - EP 1018267 A2

EP 1018267 A2 2000-07-12 - PAY-PER-VIEW PROGRAM ACCESS CONTROL SYSTEM

Title (en)

PAY-PER-VIEW PROGRAM ACCESS CONTROL SYSTEM

Title (de)

ZUGANGSKONTROLLSYSTEM FÜR BEZAHLFERNSEHEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMANDE D'ACCES A UNE EMISSION A LA CARTE

Publication

EP 1018267 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98949486 A

Priority

  • US 9820045 W
  • US 5978497 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916246A2] A pay-per-view program access control system which combines a television signal with a telephone control signal to allow a remotely located telephone connection to be coupled to a television receiver via a signal wire or transmission line. The television signal is combined with the telephone control signal and the combined signals are then separated at a remote location by a splitter. Once separated, the television signal and telephone control signal can be used as if they had been transmitted to the remote location separately.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/10; H04H 1/00; H04H 1/02; H04H 7/00; H04M 13/00; H04N 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/173 (2006.01); H04B 3/38 (2006.01); H04H 20/63 (2008.01); H04M 11/00 (2006.01); H04M 11/08 (2006.01); H04N 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 11/085 (2013.01); H04B 3/38 (2013.01); H04H 20/63 (2013.01); H04N 7/10 (2013.01); H04H 2201/33 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9916246 A2 19990401; WO 9916246 A3 19990617; AU 9579798 A 19990412; EP 1018267 A2 20000712; EP 1018267 A4 20011128; JP 2001517903 A 20011009

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020712

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TERK, NEIL D.

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TERK, NEIL

2001-12-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BUCZKIEWICZ, ROBERT, T.

2001-11-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL