Global Patent Index - EP 1018288 A1

EP 1018288 A1 2000-07-12 - CAR RADIO SYSTEM

Title (en)

CAR RADIO SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUTORADIOANLAGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'AUTORADIO

Publication

EP 1018288 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928089 A

Priority

  • DE 9800901 W
  • DE 19742087 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19742087A1] The system has at least one loudspeaker (1,2) with a socket (5) for connecting a set of headphones (6) and a switch (15) with which reproduction via the loudspeaker can be cut off. The connecting socket and switch can be integral

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 1/10 (2006.01); H04R 3/12 (2006.01); H04R 5/04 (2006.01); H04R 5/033 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 5/04 (2013.01); H04R 3/12 (2013.01); H04R 1/1041 (2013.01); H04R 5/033 (2013.01); H04R 2420/03 (2013.01); H04R 2499/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9916286A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19742087 A1 19990325; EP 1018288 A1 20000712; EP 1018288 B1 20020703; ES 2180178 T3 20030201; JP 2001517917 A 20011009; US 6567655 B1 20030520; WO 9916286 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050328

2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040329

2005-03-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050328

2005-03-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050328

2004-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-03-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040305

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-03-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030311

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180178 T3

2002-10-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804689 20020808

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010718

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000425

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT