Global Patent Index - EP 1018307 A1

EP 1018307 A1 2000-07-12 - BUCKLE

Title (en)

BUCKLE

Title (de)

SCHNALLE

Title (fr)

BOUCLE

Publication

EP 1018307 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99931452 A

Priority

  • JP 9903890 W
  • JP 21126298 A

Abstract (en)

A buckle is provided in which a number of parts can be reduced and which can reliably maintain a latched state. When a tongue plate is engaged (latched) by a lock plate, presser members of a cam urged by a return spring abut receiving surfaces of the lock plate, and therefore, a latched state cannot be inadvertently released. Further, when the latched state is to be released, by pressing a release button, a claw is pushed such that a cam rotates, and the presser members separate from the receiving surfaces. As a result the return spring is compressed, and due to elastic force of the return spring, the release button returns to its original position. In this way, because the return spring carries out both the operation of urging the cam and the operation of returning the release button to its original position, the number of parts is reduced. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 11/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/26 (2006.01); A44B 11/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/2523 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4019 (2013.01); Y10T 24/45623 (2013.01); Y10T 24/45644 (2013.01); Y10T 24/45665 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018307 A1 20000712; EP 1018307 A4 20060809; EP 1018307 B1 20121121; JP 2000041709 A 20000215; JP 3650271 B2 20050518; US 6367129 B1 20020409; WO 0005988 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-12-19 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69944486

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-01-17 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69944486

- Effective date: 20130117

2012-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2012-11-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2012-07-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2008-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080718

2006-08-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20060706

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000411

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE