Global Patent Index - EP 1018350 A1

EP 1018350 A1 2000-07-12 - Wedge to raise a fixation device on a snowboard

Title (en)

Wedge to raise a fixation device on a snowboard

Title (de)

Keil zum Erhöhen einer Fixation an einem Snowboard

Title (fr)

Cale prévue pour réhausser une fixation par rapport à une planche destinée à la pratique sur neige

Publication

EP 1018350 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99125495 A

Priority

FR 9900166 A

Abstract (en)

The wedge (6), designed to fit between the upper surface of a snowboard (3) and the underside of a boot fastening (4), is made from a deformable material, apart from a circular central section (30) which extends between the wedge's upper and lower surfaces and is of a non-deformable material. The central section has at least one hole (31) through it and is made from a rigid plastic, metal or composition material, whereas the remainder of the wedge is of a supple plastic or rubber foam.

Abstract (fr)

Cale (6, 40, 50, 60, 70, 80, 90) pour réhausser une fixation (4, 5) par rapport à une planche (3) destinée à la pratique du surf sur neige. La cale (6, 40, 50, 60, 70, 80, 90) présente une épaisseur, une longueur, et une largeur, ainsi qu'une zone avant (FA), une zone centrale (CA), et une zone arrière (RA). La cale (6, 40, 50, 60, 70, 80, 90) est caractérisée par le fait qu'elle est réalisée avec au moins un matériau déformable à l'exception d'au moins une portion (30, 41, 51, 61, 71, 81), la portion (30, 41, 51, 61, 71, 81) étant réalisée avec un matériau sensiblement non déformable, la portion (30, 41, 51, 61, 71, 81) étant située dans la zone centrale (CA) et s'étendant d'une face supérieure (24, 43, 54, 66, 73, 83) à une face inférieure (25, 44, 55, 67, 74, 84) de la cale (6, 40, 50, 60, 70, 80, 90). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/08; A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/14 (2012.01); A63C 10/18 (2012.01); A63C 10/26 (2012.01); A63C 10/28 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/285 (2013.01); A63C 10/14 (2013.01); A63C 10/18 (2013.01); A63C 10/26 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2733690 A1 19961108 - ROSSIGNOL SA [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018350 A1 20000712; EP 1018350 B1 20040616; DE 69918045 D1 20040722; DE 69918045 T2 20050707; FR 2788004 A1 20000707; FR 2788004 B1 20010330; JP 3070148 U 20000718

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-12-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041229

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69918045

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR LI

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI