Global Patent Index - EP 1018369 A1

EP 1018369 A1 2000-07-12 - Device for debasing coins

Title (en)

Device for debasing coins

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Zerstörung von Münzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de destruction de pièces de monnaie

Publication

EP 1018369 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250438 A

Priority

DE 19901790 A

Abstract (en)

The means for supplying the coins as well as the means for destroying the coins have in the normal operating state no engagement opening. The means (3) for destroying the coins have at least two cylindrical cutting or deformation elements (5) whose cylinder shafts form rotary axes driven in opposite rotations. The distance between the rotary axes is less than the sum of the cylinder radii of two oppositely rotating cutting or deformation elements (5) plus a maximum coin thickness. The rotary axes are in a horizontal plane and the tangential speed vector at the cylinder sleeve faces of the cutting elements in the area between the rotary axes has a component directed vertically downwards

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (1) zur Zerstörung von Münzen, mit Mitteln (2) zur Zuführung der Münzen, mit Mitteln (3) zur Zerstörung der Münzen und mit Mitteln (4) zum Abführen und/oder Sammeln der zerstörten Münzen. Die Mittel (2) zur Zuführung der Münzen sowie die Mittel (3) zur Zerstörung der Münzen weisen in einem Normalbetriebszustand keine Eingriffsöffnung auf. Die Mittel (3) zur Zerstörung der Münzen weisen zumindest zwei im wesentlichen zylinderförmige Schneid- oder Deformationselemente (5) auf, deren Zylinderachsen Drehachsen (6) sind, und welche im Gegensinn zueinander rotierend antreibbar sind. Der Abstand der Drehachsen (6) ist kleiner als die Summe der Zylinderradien (7) von zwei gegeneinander rotierenden Schneid- oder Deformationselementen (5) plus einer maximalen Münzendicke. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 19/12; B02C 18/14; B02C 18/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 19/00 (2006.01); B02C 18/14 (2006.01); B02C 18/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/182 (2013.01); B02C 18/142 (2013.01); B02C 19/0056 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018369 A1 20000712; DE 19901790 A1 20000720; DE 19901790 C2 20010607

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B02C 19/00 20060101AFI20090119BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B02C 18/14 20060101ALI20090119BHEP

2009-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B02C 18/18 20060101ALI20090119BHEP

2008-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080317

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCAN COIN INDUSTRIES AB

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010105;LT PAYMENT 20010105;LV PAYMENT 20010105;MK PAYMENT 20010105;RO PAYMENT 20010105;SI PAYMENT 20010105

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010105

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI