Global Patent Index - EP 1018374 A1

EP 1018374 A1 2000-07-12 - Sprayer mountable on a bottle of mineral water

Title (en)

Sprayer mountable on a bottle of mineral water

Title (de)

Auf Mineralwasser enthaltenden Flaschen befestigbarer Zerstäuber

Title (fr)

Brumisateur adaptable sur une bouteille d'eau minérale

Publication

EP 1018374 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400010 A

Priority

FR 9900036 A

Abstract (en)

The sprayer has a manual pump operated by a bulb or trigger actuated piston and equipped with a threaded coupling which allows it to be fitted onto a bottle of natural spring water, e.g. with a capacity of under 400 ml, after removing its screw cap. The bottle should be one which has a security guarantee ring to ensure it has not been previously opened.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invenetion concerne un ensemble de brumisation comportant un corps de réservoir pour recevoir le liquide à vaporiser et une tête de pompe manuelle présentant une buse. Le corps de réservoir est constitué par une bouteille d'eau minérale destinée à la consommation, et la pompe présente une couronne de raccordement munie d'un filetage complémentaire du filetage du col de la bouteille d'eau minérale.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/0037 (2013.01); B05B 11/0008 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018374 A1 20000712; FR 2788038 A1 20000707; FR 2788038 B1 20010302

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040817

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040405

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001104

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI