Global Patent Index - EP 1018380 A1

EP 1018380 A1 2000-07-12 - Device for hydroforming a hollow profile or similar workpiece

Title (en)

Device for hydroforming a hollow profile or similar workpiece

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Umformen eines Hohlprofils od.dgl. Werkstückes auf den Wege des Innenhochdruck-Umformens

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'hydroformage d'un profilé creux ou similaire

Publication

EP 1018380 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99811200 A

Priority

  • DE 19900275 A
  • DE 19905850 A

Abstract (en)

The tool has a die part (40) of limited flexible plastic material, which is inserted into, and seals the profile chamber (12) of a hollow profile or component (10). An additional tool element (54) of a high strength material is positioned around the flexible part and engages on the hollow profile when the tool is moved into operational position. The die part is cup-shaped with base plate (42) and wall (44), it consists esp. of polyurethane, and is connected to a metal die (16). The additional tool element is of a metal material, containing pref. mainly iron, and a carbon proportion of no more than 2%.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zum Umformen eines als Ein- oder Mehrkammerprofil ausgebildeten Hohlprofils (10) od. dgl. Werkstückes mittels eines in seinem abgedichteten und von einem Stempel (16) übergriffenen Profilraum (12) durch ein strömbares Wirkmedium erzeugten Innenhochdrucks, ist am Umfang eines in den Profilraum (12) des Hohlprofils (10) oder Werkstücks einführbaren und dichtenden Stempelteils (40,40b) aus begrenzt flexiblem Kunststoff wenigstens ein Zusatzelement (54,54e,58) aus einem Werkstoff hoher Festigkeit vorgesehen, das an dem begrenzt flexiblen Stempelteil (40,40b) außenseitig einen Bereich bildet, der beim Überführen in die Betriebsstellung an das Hohlprofil (10) angelegt wird. Das bevorzugt trogartige Stempelteil (40,40b) weist eine Bodenplatte (42) mit daran angeformt umlaufender Wandung (44) auf; letztere begrenzt einen Innenraum. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/045 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018380 A1 20000712; EP 1018380 B1 20020529; AT 218076 T 20020615; DK 1018380 T3 20020923; ES 2178367 T3 20021216; PT 1018380 E 20021031

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021223

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051224

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051224

2005-12-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051224

2005-12-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2005-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-08-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041223

2005-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-01-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050110

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041223

2004-12-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041223

2004-12-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-12-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031223

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031219

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031219

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031128

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-01 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-08-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT A.G.

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-05-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-12-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178367 T3

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-09-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-08-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020729

2002-07-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901538 20020704

2002-06-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010112

2002-05-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 218076 T 20020615

2001-11-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010112

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI