Global Patent Index - EP 1018385 A2

EP 1018385 A2 2000-07-12 - Method and apparatus for bottom pouring of light metal alloy

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for bottom pouring of light metal alloy

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum steigenden Giessen von Leichtmetall

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour couler du métal léger en source

Publication

EP 1018385 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124107 A

Priority

DE 19900574 A

Abstract (en)

Process for casting light metals in sand or permanent molds comprises removing the mold (8) from its horizontal casting position into a casting position deviating from this in the casting station using a turning device (1) on the conveying path (6), and connecting to a riser pipe and at the same time to a lock (15) on the turning device. The lock closes the mold and the mold is placed back on the same conveying path. The lock remains in the closed position up to the casting position. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for carrying out the casting process.

Abstract (de)

Beim steigenden Gießen von Leichtmetall in Sand- oder Dauerformen, die auf einer Förderstrecke transportiert werden, wird die Form aus ihrer waagrechten Position in der Förderstrecke in eine senkrechte Gießposition mit tief liegendem Einguß verbracht und von der Seite her aus einem Schmelzeofen über ein Steigrohr befüllt. Nach dem Befüllen wird der Einguß durch einen Verschluß verschlossen und die Form in die Förderposition zurückgesetzt. Eine dieses Verfahren ermöglichende Vorrichtung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die Gießstation an dem Förderer angeordnet ist und eine Einrichtung zum Wenden der Form aus der Förderposition in die Gießposition vorgesehen ist. Desweiteren weist die Vorrichtung einen gegebenenfalls kühlenden Verschluß auf, mittels dessen der Einguß nach dem Gießen und zumindest solange verschlossen ist, bis die Form wieder ihre waagerechte Position erreicht hat. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 18/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 18/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 18/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018385 A2 20000712; EP 1018385 A3 20000719; DE 19900574 A1 20000713

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050618

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040527

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DISA INDUSTRIES A/S

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 22D 18/04 A, 7B 22D 47/00 B

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI