Global Patent Index - EP 1018408 A1

EP 1018408 A1 2000-07-12 - Guillotine-type machine for cutting stacked sheet material

Title (en)

Guillotine-type machine for cutting stacked sheet material

Title (de)

Planschneidmaschine zum Schneiden von gestapeltem, blattförmigem Gut

Title (fr)

Guillotine pour couper des produits en feuilles empilées

Publication

EP 1018408 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98124487 A

Priority

EP 98124487 A

Abstract (en)

The planar cutting machine has a table (3) for supporting the stacked sheet material, divided into a rear section (5) supporting the residual sheet stack and a relatively movable front section (9) for receiving the cut section of the sheet stack, located between a pair of cooperating rails, with a cooperating feed slide (67) used for transfer of the cut sheet stack to a further proicessing station. One of the latter rails is provided by a mobile alignment station (22), attached to the planar cutting machine adjacent the table front section.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Planschneidmaschine (1) zum Schneiden von gestapeltem, blattförmigem Gut, mit einem Tisch (3) zur Aufnahme des Gutes. Ein hinteres Tischteil (5) dient der Aufnahme des zu schneidenden Gutes, ein vorderes Tischteil (9) der Aufnahme des geschnittenen Gutes. Die beiden Tischteile sind zur Bildung eines Spaltes auseinanderschiebbar. Ein erstes bewegliches Lineal (31) ist im Bereich des vorderen Tischteiles anordbar. Ein zweites bewegliches Lineal ist nach dem Öffnen des Spaltes in seiner Arbeitslage bringbar, derart, daß zwischen den beiden Linealen ein Querkanal für das geschnittene Gut gebildet ist. Mittels eines Ausschiebers (67), der längs des Querkanals beweglich ist, kann das geschnittene Gut beispielsweise einer Weiterverarbeitungsstation zugeführt werden. Um mit ein und derselben Planschneidmaschine nicht nur Schnitte zur Erzeugung von Teilstapeln und der bei Schnitten senkrecht hierzu erzeugten kleinen Stapel durchführen zu können, sondern auch die kleinen Stapel automatisch der Weiterverarbeitung zuführen zu können, schlägt die Erfindung vor, daß mit der Planschneidmaschine im Bereich des vorderen Tischteils eine mobile Richtstation (22) verbindbar ist, wobei die mobile Richtstation das erste Lineal aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/01; B26D 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01); B26D 7/18 (2006.01); B26D 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/32 (2013.01); B26D 7/015 (2013.01); B26D 7/0675 (2013.01); B26D 7/18 (2013.01); B26D 2007/0056 (2013.01); B26D 2007/322 (2013.01); Y10T 83/2048 (2015.04); Y10T 83/8821 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018408 A1 20000712; EP 1018408 B1 20021002; DE 59805844 D1 20021107; JP 2000198098 A 20000718; US 2002148335 A1 20021017

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805844

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091228

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091228

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091228

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030115

2003-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2003-01-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805844 20021107

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021002

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI