Global patent index - EP 1018414 A1

EP 1018414 A1 2000-07-12 - Knife ring cutter for cutting chips

Title (en)

Knife ring cutter for cutting chips

Title (de)

Messerring-Zerspaner zum Zerspanen von Hackschnitzeln

Title (fr)

Déchiqueteuse à lames-couronne pour couper des coupeaux

Publication

EP 1018414 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100016 A

Priority

  • DE 19900566 A
  • US 66714400 A

Abstract (en)

The cutter has a knife ring with knives and a rotor with blades (2.1). Rail-shaped splitting knives (2.2) are each fastened to a rotor blade via screws (2.4). Several screw connections for a knife have a common wedge part (2.5), which decreases in size in a radial outward direction. The part is a single strip. Each knife has bores (2.3) with radial axis, for the screws. The radial outer section of the blades is protected against wear by a wearing plate (2.6).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Messerring-Zerspaner zum Zerspanen von Hackschnitzeln, mit einem Messerring (1), umfassend einen Kranz von Messerpaketen sowie zwei diese tragenden Tragringe, die jeweils an den Enden der Messerpakete angeordnet sind; jedes Messerpaket weist ein Messer (1.1) auf, das gegen die Radialrichtung geneigt ist und dessen Schneide nach innen weist; mit einem Rotor (2), der koaxial zu Messerring (1) angeordnet und von diesem umschlossen ist; der Rotor weist eine Vielzahl von Rotorschaufeln (2.1) auf, die an ihren äußeren Enden leistenförmige Spaltmesser (2.2) tragen, die ihrerseits achsparallel verlaufen und sich über die Rotorbreite erstrecken; jedes Spaltmesser (2.2) ist mittels Schrauben (2.4) an der zugehörenden Rotorschaufel(2.1) befestigt. Gemäß der Erfindung weist jede Schraubverbindung ein Keilelement (2.5) auf, das sich - in einem achssenkrechten Schnitt gesehen - in radialer Richtung nach außen keilförmig verjüngt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27L 11/00; B02C 13/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23C 3/28 (2006.01); B02C 13/28 (2006.01); B23C 5/08 (2006.01); B27L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27L 11/005 (2013.01); B02C 18/144 (2013.01); B02C 18/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3247629 C1 19840322 - MAIER B MASCHF GMBH CO KG

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018414 A1 20000712; EP 1018414 B1 20040707; BR 0000029 A 20001114; DE 19900566 A1 20000713; DE 19900566 B4 20050324; ES 2223316 T3 20050301; JP 2000198013 A 20000718; JP 4897134 B2 20120314; US 6558237 B1 20030506

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150104

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160226

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150103

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150103

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140109

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-05-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2223316

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040707

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT

2004-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI