Global patent index - EP 1018429 A1

EP 1018429 A1 2000-07-12 - Replaceable capping system for inkjet printheads

Title (en)

Replaceable capping system for inkjet printheads

Title (de)

Auswechselbare Abdeckvorrichtung für Tintenstrahldruckköpfe

Title (fr)

Système de capuchon remplaçable pour têtes d'impression à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1018429 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00300044 A

Priority

US 22744899 A

Abstract (en)

A replaceable inkjet printhead cleaner service station system (70) has separate replaceable cleaning units (80, 82, 84, 86) for each printhead (60, 62, 64, 66) in an inkjet printing mechanism (20), which has a pallet (72) that moves the cleaning units translationally to service the printheads. Each cleaning unit (80, 82, 84, 86) has a printhead wiper (125), a printhead snout wiper (190), a capping system (170), a spittoon (108), and optionally, an ink solvent application system (134). A service station pallet (72) moves a replaceable base (102) between rest and sealing positions, with the base defining a cam surface (110). A sled (150) has a cam follower (152) that rides along the cam surface (110), with the sled (150) supporting a cap lip (170). An activation wall (151) extends from the sled (150) to engage the printhead (60, 62, 64, 66) and move the sled (150) along the cam surface (110) to the sealing position through linear motion (76) of the pallet (72) while the printhead remains stationary. A method is provided for sealing an inkjet printhead (60, 62, 64, 66), along with a printing mechanism (20) employing such a capping system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/165 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/16547 (2013.01); B41J 2/16508 (2013.01); B41J 2/16538 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018429 A1 20000712; EP 1018429 B1 20050525; DE 60020274 D1 20050630; DE 60020274 T2 20060511; JP 2000203038 A 20000725; SG 83151 A1 20010918; US 6135585 A 20001024; US 6203135 B1 20010320; US 6402290 B1 20020611; US 6520619 B1 20030218

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140106

2014-11-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60020274

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140106

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60020274

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121226

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120329 AND 20120404

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-05-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-06-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60020274

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-05-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-12-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: REPLACEABLE CAPPING SYSTEM FOR INKJET PRINTHEADS

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040204

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI