Global Patent Index - EP 1018439 A1

EP 1018439 A1 2000-07-12 - PAPER FOR USE IN BOTH INK-JET RECORDING AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC RECORDING

Title (en)

PAPER FOR USE IN BOTH INK-JET RECORDING AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC RECORDING

Title (de)

PAPIER FÜR DAS TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN UND DAS ELEKTROPHOTOGRAPHISCHE AUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PAPIER UTILISE DANS UN ENREGISTREMENT PAR JET D'ENCRE ET DANS UN ENREGISTREMENT ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE

Publication

EP 1018439 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99929845 A

Priority

  • JP 9903812 W
  • JP 20171098 A
  • JP 21685198 A

Abstract (en)

The object of the present invention is to provide a paper for ink jet and electrophotographic recording of plain paper type which is excellent in water resistance of images in ink jet recording and excellent in toner transferability and running property in electrophotographic recording. According to the present invention, there is provided a paper for ink jet and electrophotographic recording which a cationic resin is adhered to a support in a dry adhering amount of 0.5-2.0 g/m<2> and which has a surface resistivity of 1.0 x 10<9> - 9.9 x 10<13> OMEGA . Preferably, the cationic resin has a cation equivalent of 3-8 meq/g measured by colloidal titration method, and the internal sizing agent used in the support is a neutral rosin sizing agent or an alkenyl succinic anhydride. The support may contain a water paper pulp.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00; G03G 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); G03G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 7/0073 (2013.01); B41M 5/508 (2013.01); B41M 5/5245 (2013.01); G03G 7/0006 (2013.01); G03G 7/0026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018439 A1 20000712; EP 1018439 A4 20010516; EP 1018439 B1 20030502; AU 4652299 A 20000207; CN 1166519 C 20040915; CN 1273554 A 20001115; DE 69907390 D1 20030605; DE 69907390 T2 20031211; ID 24315 A 20000713; JP 2000085239 A 20000328; JP 4119012 B2 20080716; KR 100362690 B1 20030403; WO 0003878 A1 20000127

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060715

2006-07-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060715

2005-07-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69907390

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-05-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE