Global Patent Index - EP 1018442 A1

EP 1018442 A1 2000-07-12 - Device for closing the flap of an envelope

Title (en)

Device for closing the flap of an envelope

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Schliessen von Briefumschlägen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fermer le rabat d'une enveloppe

Publication

EP 1018442 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250400 A

Priority

DE 19900686 A

Abstract (en)

Closing module (4) located between franking unit (3) and stacking position (6) has driven closing roller pair (42). Letter is fed from letter separating unit (2) having moistening device, to franking unit where envelope flap is partially closed by press elements and to closure module where it is completely closed by closing roller pair of fixed driven roller and spring held driven roller.

Abstract (de)

Anordnung zum Schließen von Briefumschlägen in einem Briefpostverarbeitungssystem, nachdem die Leimkante der Umschlagklappen befeuchtet worden ist. Zweck ist eine Vergrößerung des Einsatzbereiches und der Funktionssicherheit. Aufgabengemäß sollen die Briefumschläge trotz großer Transportgeschwindigkeit sicher geschlossen und schonend abgelegt werden. Erfindungsgemäß sind nacheinander eine den Briefumschlag 1 unverschlossen abgebende Briefvereinzelungsvorrichtung 2 mit einer Befeuchtungsvorrichtung, eine optional mit einer Waage versehene Frankiereinrichtung 3, in der die Umschlagklappe 11 mit der angefeuchteten Leimkante mittels zum Transport des Briefumschlages 1 dienender Andruckelementen 33 gegen die Umschlagtasche 12 gedrückt wird, und ein Schließmodul 4 mit einem für Mischpostbetrieb angepaßt gestalteten Schließwalzenpaar 42 vorgesehen. Da zwischen Leimkantenbefeuchtung und Schließen des Briefumschlages 1 mindestens der Gesamtablauf in der Frankiereinrichtung 3 liegt, wird auch bei großen Transportgeschwindigkeiten ausreichend Zeit gewonnen, um den Leim genügend anzulösen und den Briefumschlag 1 sicher zu schließen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43M 3/04; B43M 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/042 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1798 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018442 A1 20000712; EP 1018442 B1 20031008; CN 1140420 C 20040303; CN 1259440 A 20000712; DE 19900686 A1 20000720; DE 19900686 C2 20021024; US 6322663 B1 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59907280

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131112

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120908

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040122

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907280

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020826

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI