Global Patent Index - EP 1018460 A2

EP 1018460 A2 2000-07-12 - Multi-circuit protection valve for compressed air production installations in vehicles

Title (en)

Multi-circuit protection valve for compressed air production installations in vehicles

Title (de)

Mehrkreisschutzventil für Druckluftbeschaffungsanlagen von Kraftfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Valve de protection pour plusieurs circuits pour installations de production d'air comprimé dans des véhicules

Publication

EP 1018460 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122380 A

Priority

DE 19854205 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19854205A1] The valve has at least two overflow valves associated with each circuit, each with a valve element (4) in contact with a spring (5) and forming a gate valve with a valve seat to an air load associated with one of the circuits. Each valve is controlled by a control unit associated with its circuit and has an actuation unit. Each valve element is a differential piston (10) with a piston seal (12) that reduces the effective surface (14) on the side remote from the spring and the force of the spring is dimensioned according to the desired opening pressure of the overflow valve on the reduced effective surface.

Abstract (de)

Ein Mehrkreisschutzventil (1) für Druckluftbeschaffungsanlagen von Kraftfahrzeugen, weist mindestens zwei je einem Kreis zugeordnete Überströmventile (3) auf. Jedes Überströmventil (3) besitzt ein auf einer Feder (5) abgestütztes Ventilglied (4), das mit einem Ventilsitz ein Durchlaßventil (8, 9) für die Druckluft zu einem dem Kreis zugeordneten Luftverbraucher bildet. Es ist je eine dem Kreis zugeordnete Steuereinheit (38) zum gesteuerten Öffnen des Durchlaßventils (8, 9) vorgesehen, die eine Betätigungseinheit (27) mit einem Kolben (28) und einem Stößel (30) aufweist. Das Ventilglied (4) jedes Überströmventils (3) ist als Differentialkolben (10) mit Kolbendichtung (12) ausgebildet. Die von der zugeführten Druckluft beaufschlagte Wirkfläche auf der der Feder (5) abgekehrten Seite des Ventilgliedes (4) ist durch die Kolbendichtung (12) zu einer Teilwirkfläche (14) reduziert. Die Kraft der Feder (5) ist entsprechend dem gewünschten Öffnungsdruck des Überströmventils (3) auf diese reduzierte Teilwirkfläche (14) dimensioniert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60T 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60T 11/32 (2006.01); B60T 17/00 (2006.01); B60T 17/04 (2006.01); G05D 16/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60T 11/32 (2013.01); B60T 17/004 (2013.01); B60T 17/04 (2013.01); G05D 16/2093 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19854205 A1 20000531; EP 1018460 A2 20000712; EP 1018460 A3 20010321; EP 1018460 B1 20020424; ES 2174564 T3 20021101

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59901292

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130601

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111110

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120731

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101110

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101111

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101110

2011-06-28 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101111

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081111

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20081111

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2174564

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901292

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-29

2002-05-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020426

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-04-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 60T 17/02 A, 7B 60T 8/24 B

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI