Global Patent Index - EP 1018469 A2

EP 1018469 A2 2000-07-12 - Bag filling apparatus

Title (en)

Bag filling apparatus

Title (de)

Fülleinrichtung zum Befüllen von Säcken

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour remplir des sacs

Publication

EP 1018469 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890400 A

Priority

AT 1299 U

Abstract (en)

The filling device has a filling attachment (17) and two pairs of clamping arms (14). The filling attachment is made from elastically deformable material and is under the action of a pressing device (5) which in the pressing position compresses the filling attachment flat. The clamping arms are mounted on either side of the pressing device so that the internal distance between the pairs of arms exceeds the maximum extension of the cross-section of the filling attachment in the pressed state. The pressing device can be formed by a pair of expanding arms and an elastic band connected to same and looped round the filling attachment

Abstract (de)

Fülleinrichtung zum Befüllen von Säcken, insbesondere mit körnigem Schüttgut, bei der ein mit einem Vorratsbehälter in Verbindung stehender verschließbarer Füllansatz (17) und mindestens ein Paar von zumindest mittelbar um eine Schwenkachse (2) schwenkbar gehaltene Klemmarmen (14) zum Halten eines zu befüllenden Sackes (16) vorgesehen sind. Um ein hohes Maß an Dichtheit zwischen dem zu befüllenden Sack (16) und dem Füllansatz (17) zu erreichen, ist vorgesehen, daß der Füllansatz (17) aus einem elastisch verformbaren Material hergestellt ist und eine auf diesen einwirkende Preßeinrichtung (5,9; 18, 19) vorgesehen ist, die in deren Preßstellung den Füllansatz (17) flach zusammendrücken, wobei zwei Paare von Klemmarmen (14) vorgesehen sind, die zu beiden Seiten der Preßeinrichtung (5, 9; 18, 19), bzw. des Füllansatzes (17) angeordnet sind, wobei der lichte Abstand der Paare von Klemmarmen (14) die größte Erstreckung des Querschnittes des Füllansatzes (17) in dessen gepreßtem Zustand übersteigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 43/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/465 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018469 A2 20000712; EP 1018469 A3 20020102; US 6138723 A 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040831

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030429

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI