Global Patent Index - EP 1018475 A1

EP 1018475 A1 2000-07-12 - Conveying device with a hopper

Title (en)

Conveying device with a hopper

Title (de)

Fördereinrichtung mit einem Trichter

Title (fr)

Convoyeur équipé d'une trémie

Publication

EP 1018475 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00100026 A

Priority

DE 19900176 A

Abstract (en)

The conveyor (2) is set in a housing (4) having a rectangular inlet opening (15). Between a circular funnel opening (13) and its square outlet opening (14) is a cylindrical wall member (16') and flat frusto-pyramidal wall members (17,17'). These wall members have a large surface and are clearly longer in the direction of the funnel axis than the cylindrical wall member. Large-surface intermediate wall members (18) which are curved in cross-section and triangular have approximately the same length as the flat wall members and are mounted between same. The intermediate wall members have narrow ends (20) with channel-like cross-section.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Fördereinrichtung für feinkörniges oder pulverförmiges Schüttgut, insbesondere mit einem schneckenartigen Förderer 2 in einem Gehäuse 4, das eine rechteckige Eintrittsöffnung 15 aufweist, sowie mit einem auf dem Gehäuse 4 über dessen Eintrittsöffnung 15 angeordneten Trichter 12, der gehäuseseitig eine rechteckige Austrittsöffnung 14 und an seinem anderen Ende 16 eine kreisförmige Trichteröffnung 13 aufweist und zwischen seiner kreisförmigen Trichteröffnung 13 und seiner viereckigen Austrittsöffnung 14 ein zylindrisches Wandstück 16' sowie mindestens teilweise ebene, pyramidenstumpfförmige Wandstücke 17, 17' und zwischen diesen Zwischenwandstücke 18 aufweist. Der Kern der Erfindung besteht darin, daß die ebenen, pyramidenstumpfförmigen Wandstücke 17, 17' großflächig und in Richtung der Trichterachse 19 deutlich länger sind als das zylindrische Wandstück 16' und daß großflächige, im Querschnitt bogenförmige sowie in Abwicklung etwa dreieckige Zwischenwandstücke 18 mit annähernd gleicher Länge wie die ebenen Wandstücke 17, 17' jeweils zwischen diesen angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 2943752 A 19600705 - PLATT DONALD D
  • [A] GB 1230863 A 19710505
  • [Y] P. RIGAUT: "Conseils pratiques aux fondeurs - Trémies d'alimentation des machines à mouler", FONDERIE, no. 51, March 1950 (1950-03-01), Paris, pages 1987 - 1992, XP002135718

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018475 A1 20000712; CA 2295338 A1 20000707; DE 19900176 A1 20000713; US 6340279 B1 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040406

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020524

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI