Global patent index - EP 1018479 A2

EP 1018479 A2 2000-07-12 - Traverse device for automatic winder

Title (en)

Traverse device for automatic winder

Title (de)

Traversiervorrichtung für automatische Aufwickelmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de trancannage pour bobinoir automatique

Publication

EP 1018479 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99124772 A

Priority

JP 203699 A

Abstract (en)

In conventional automatic winders, during knotting, a belt traverse device is reversely rotated in response to the reverse rotation of a drum, causing a yarn to be caught at a traverse end. According to the present invention, a clutch device is interposed between a speed change mechanism section 10 and traverse mechanism section 20, and during knotting, the clutch device is disconnected to block power transmission to the traverse mechanism section 20. The clutch device comprises a ball clutch comprising an output gear 15 having balls 15a buried therein and a clutch plate 14 having as many clutch holes as the balls in which the balls are fitted. The speed change mechanism section and the traverse mechanism section can be connected together only with a set phase. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 63/036; B65H 54/28; B65H 54/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/02 (2006.01); B65H 54/28 (2006.01); B65H 54/42 (2006.01); B65H 54/74 (2006.01); B65H 63/036 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2821 (2013.01); B65H 54/388 (2013.01); B65H 54/74 (2013.01); B65H 63/036 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1018479 A2 20000712; EP 1018479 A3 20010131; JP 2000198621 A 20000718

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20021118

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020930

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE LI

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010423

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI